TX SB258 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on May 2 2023 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-17 - Left pending in committee
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to energy efficiency goals for electric utilities.
Title
Relating to energy efficiency goals for electric utilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Sarah Eckhardt [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Nathan Johnson [D] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] |
Sen. Royce West [D] | Sen. John Whitmire [D] | Sen. Judith Zaffirini [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment (Y: 18 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-02 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 23 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-17 | House | Left pending in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee |
2023-05-17 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-17 | House | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-05-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-05-06 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-02 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-26 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-25 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-18 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Referred to Business & Commerce |
2023-02-15 | Senate | Read first time |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Filed |
2022-12-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |