TX SB26 | 2021-2022 | 87th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 15-2)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-06 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the prohibited suspension of laws protecting religious freedom and prohibited closure of places of worship.
Title
Relating to the prohibited suspension of laws protecting religious freedom and prohibited closure of places of worship.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Record vote (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Amendment tabled (Y: 28 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-03-25 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 22 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-06 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-04-06 | House | Read first time |
2021-03-29 | House | Received from the Senate |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Passed to engrossment |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment tabled |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Johnson |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Record vote |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-23 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2021-03-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-09 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2021-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Read first time |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
2021-03-01 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1239 (Same As) 2021-06-16 - Effective immediately
SB251 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to State Affairs
SB251 (Same As) 2021-03-03 - Referred to State Affairs