TX SB2620 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to authorizing certain political subdivisions to change the date on which their general election for officers is held.
Title
Relating to authorizing certain political subdivisions to change the date on which their general election for officers is held.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-05-26 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Reason for vote recorded in Journal RV#2045 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#2044 (Y: 48 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Reason for vote recorded in Journal RV#2045 (Y: 138 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-24 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#2044 (Y: 48 N: 78 NV: 1 Abs: 22) [FAIL]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-11 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-29 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-28 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-27 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-26 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-26 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-26 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-24 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2045 |
2023-05-24 | House | Passed |
2023-05-24 | House | Reason for vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-24 | House | Record vote RV#2044 |
2023-05-24 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Leo-Wilson |
2023-05-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2023-05-23 | House | Amended 1-Spiller |
2023-05-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-23 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-21 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-05-20 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-05-20 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-05-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-05-18 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2023-05-15 | House | Referred to Elections |
2023-05-15 | House | Read first time |
2023-05-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Passed |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-05-11 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-05-10 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-05-04 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2023-04-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |