TX SB31 | 2011-2012 | 82nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 17 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-06-17 - Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the composition of the districts for the election of members of the Texas Senate.
Title
Relating to the composition of the districts for the election of members of the Texas Senate.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-17 | Effective in 90 days -- 8/29/11 | |
2011-06-17 | Signed by the Governor | |
2011-05-24 | Sent to the Governor | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2011-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2011-05-21 | Reported enrolled | |
2011-05-21 | House passage reported | |
2011-05-21 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-21 | Record vote | |
2011-05-21 | Passed | |
2011-05-21 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Passed to 3rd reading | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-20 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-20 | Record vote | |
2011-05-20 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-20 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-20 | Placed on Major State Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2011-05-18 | Committee report distributed | |
2011-05-18 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2011-05-18 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2011-05-18 | Amendment(s) considered in committee | |
2011-05-18 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for formal meeting on . . . | |
2011-05-17 | Referred to Redistricting | |
2011-05-17 | Read first time | |
2011-05-17 | Received from the Senate | |
2011-05-17 | Reported engrossed | |
2011-05-17 | Remarks ordered printed | |
2011-05-17 | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Reason for vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed as amended | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Amended | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-17 | Read 3rd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Three day rule suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Passed to engrossment as amended | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment withdrawn | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment adopted as substituted | |
2011-05-17 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment substituted | |
2011-05-17 | Substitute amendment offered | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment tabled | |
2011-05-17 | Amendment(s) offered | |
2011-05-17 | Read 2nd time | |
2011-05-17 | Record vote | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-17 | Rules suspended | |
2011-05-16 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2011-05-13 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2011-05-13 | Reported favorably as substituted | |
2011-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-13 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-05-12 | Left pending in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2011-05-12 | Considered in public hearing | |
2011-05-12 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2011-01-31 | Referred to Redistricting, Select | |
2011-01-31 | Read first time | |
2011-01-03 | Filed | |
2011-01-03 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |