TX SB325 | 2017-2018 | 85th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-2)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2017 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-18 - Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence
Pending: House Criminal Jurisprudence Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the procedure for expunction of arrest records and files for certain persons who are tried for an offense and subsequently acquitted.
Title
Relating to the procedure for expunction of arrest records and files for certain persons who are tried for an offense and subsequently acquitted.
Sponsors
Sen. Konni Burton [R] | Sen. Sylvia Garcia [D] | Sen. Juan Hinojosa [D] | Sen. Donald Huffines [R] |
Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Sen. Borris Miles [D] | Sen. Jose Rodriguez [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-03 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-03 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-18 | House | Referred to Criminal Jurisprudence |
2017-04-18 | House | Read first time |
2017-04-04 | House | Received from the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Record vote |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-30 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Not again placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2017-03-20 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2017-03-14 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Referred to Criminal Justice |
2017-01-30 | Senate | Read first time |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Filed |
2016-12-14 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Courts
Courts--District
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Lawyers
Courts--District
Criminal Procedure
Criminal Procedure--General
CRIMINAL RECORDS
EXPUNCTION OF RECORDS
Lawyers