TX SB357 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on June 14 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-14 - Effective on 9/1/19
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to outdoor advertising signs regulated by the Texas Department of Transportation.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to outdoor advertising signs regulated by the Texas Department of Transportation.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-21 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-05-16 - House - Amended RV#1424 (Y: 116 N: 17 NV: 2 Abs: 15) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-14 Effective on 9/1/19
2019-06-14 Signed by the Governor
2019-05-25 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-25HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-23SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-21SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-21HouseSenate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported
2019-05-21SenateRecord vote
2019-05-21SenateSenate concurs in House amendment(s)
2019-05-21SenateRead
2019-05-21SenateHouse amendment(s) laid before the Senate
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage as amended reported
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1424
2019-05-16HousePassed as amended
2019-05-16HouseAmended 1-Canales
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading as amended
2019-05-15HouseAmendment withdrawn 4-Zwiener
2019-05-15HousePoint of order withdrawn (amendment) Rule 8, Section 10(b)
2019-05-15HouseMotion to table fails 4-Zwiener
2019-05-15HouseAmendment(s) offered 4-Zwiener
2019-05-15HouseAmendment tabled 3-Morrison
2019-05-15HouseAmended 2-Morrison
2019-05-15HouseAmended 1-Canales
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-10HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-09HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-09HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-05-06HouseReported favorably as substituted
2019-05-06HouseCommittee substitute considered in committee
2019-05-06HouseConsidered in formal meeting
2019-03-28HouseReferred to Transportation
2019-03-28HouseRead first time
2019-03-26HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-03-25SenateReported engrossed
2019-03-25SenateRecord vote
2019-03-25SenatePassed CS
2019-03-25SenateRead 3rd time
2019-03-25SenateRecord vote
2019-03-25SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-03-25SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-03-25SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-03-25SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-03-25SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-20SenateNot again placed on intent calendar
2019-03-19SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-03-13SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-11SenateCo-author authorized
2019-03-07SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-03-07SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-03-07SenateReported favorably as substituted
2019-03-06SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-03-06SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-03-06SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-07SenateReferred to Transportation
2019-02-07SenateRead first time
2019-01-15SenateFiled
2019-01-15SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB789 (Same As) 2019-02-21 - Referred to Transportation

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback