TX SB536 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 27 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-27 - Vetoed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Relating to associate judges for guardianship proceedings and protective services proceedings in certain courts.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Relating to associate judges for guardianship proceedings and protective services proceedings in certain courts.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-05-16 - House - Read 3rd time RV#1437 (Y: 140 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-23 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-27 Vetoed by the Governor
2019-05-20 Sent to the Governor
2019-05-20HouseSigned in the House
2019-05-17SenateSigned in the Senate
2019-05-16SenateReported enrolled
2019-05-16SenateHouse passage reported
2019-05-16HouseRecord vote RV#1437
2019-05-16HousePassed
2019-05-16HouseRead 3rd time
2019-05-15HousePassed to 3rd reading
2019-05-15HouseStatement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal
2019-05-15HouseRead 2nd time
2019-05-15HousePlaced on General State Calendar
2019-05-13HouseConsidered in Calendars
2019-05-08HouseCommittee report sent to Calendars
2019-05-07HouseCommittee report distributed
2019-05-07HouseComte report filed with Committee Coordinator
2019-04-29HouseReported favorably w/o amendment(s)
2019-04-29HouseConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-26HouseReferred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence
2019-04-26HouseRead first time
2019-04-23HouseReceived from the Senate
2019-04-23SenateReported engrossed
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenatePassed
2019-04-23SenateRead 3rd time
2019-04-23SenateRecord vote
2019-04-23SenateThree day rule suspended
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateRead 2nd time & passed to engrossment
2019-04-23SenateVote recorded in Journal
2019-04-23SenateRules suspended-Regular order of business
2019-04-17SenatePlaced on intent calendar
2019-04-15SenateCommittee report printed and distributed
2019-04-15SenateRecommended for local & uncontested calendar
2019-04-15SenateReported favorably w/o amendments
2019-04-15SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateLeft pending in committee
2019-04-09SenateTestimony taken in committee
2019-04-09SenateConsidered in public hearing
2019-04-09SenateScheduled for public hearing on . . .
2019-02-21SenateReferred to State Affairs
2019-02-21SenateRead first time
2019-01-30SenateFiled
2019-01-30SenateReceived by the Secretary of the Senate

Same As/Similar To

HB2803 (Same As) 2019-04-29 - Committee report sent to Calendars

Subjects


Texas State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback