TX SB671 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 6 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-17 - Committee report printed and distributed
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by or for recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.
Title
Relating to electronic benefits transfer cards used by or for recipients of benefits under certain assistance programs.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-17 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-05-14 | Senate | Posting rule suspended |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1250 (Same As) 2019-02-26 - Referred to Human Services
Subjects
HEALTH & HUMAN SERVICES COMMISSION
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF
Human Services
Human Services--Food Programs
Human Services--General
PUBLIC SAFETY, DEPARTMENT OF