TX SB780 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 5-1)
Status: Passed on June 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-06-18 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to emergency possession of certain abandoned children by designated emergency infant care providers.
Title
Relating to emergency possession of certain abandoned children by designated emergency infant care providers.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Jose Menendez [D] | Rep. Cole Hefner [R] | Rep. Mano DeAyala [R] |
Rep. William Metcalf [R] | Rep. Shelby Slawson [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-05-19 - Senate - Senate concurs in House amendment(s) (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Amended RV#1733 (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1700 (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1699 (Y: 63 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-05-16 - House - Amended RV#1733 (Y: 125 N: 15 NV: 1 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal RV#1700 (Y: 113 N: 28 NV: 2 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2023-05-15 - House - Amendment fails of adoption RV#1699 (Y: 63 N: 75 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [FAIL]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-16 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-06-18 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-06-18 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-22 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-21 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-19 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2023-05-19 | Senate | Read |
2023-05-19 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2023-05-16 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2023-05-16 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-16 | House | Record vote RV#1733 |
2023-05-16 | House | Passed as amended |
2023-05-16 | House | Amended 1-Morrison |
2023-05-16 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1700 |
2023-05-15 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-05-15 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2023-05-15 | House | Record vote RV#1699 |
2023-05-15 | House | Amendment fails of adoption 1-Ramos |
2023-05-15 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-05-15 | House | Placed on General State Calendar |
2023-05-11 | House | Considered in Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-24 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-24 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-18 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-18 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-03 | House | Referred to Human Services |
2023-04-03 | House | Read first time |
2023-03-20 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Passed |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-16 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-08 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB2010 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Left pending in committee
HB2010 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Left pending in committee
HB2010 (Same As) 2023-04-04 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Family
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety
FAMILY & PROTECTIVE SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Family--Child Protection
Fire Fighters & Police
Fire Fighters & Police--General
Health
Health--Emergency Services & Personnel
Minors
Minors--Health & Safety