TX SB822 | 2013-2014 | 83rd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 25 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-05-25 - Effective on 9/1/13
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to the regulation of certain health care provider network contract arrangements; providing an administrative penalty; authorizing a fee.
Title
Relating to the regulation of certain health care provider network contract arrangements; providing an administrative penalty; authorizing a fee.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-05-08 - House - SB 822Third Reading House (Y: 113 N: 29 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - SB 822Third Reading House (Y: 107 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Taylor, Van (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - SB 822Third Reading House (Y: 107 N: 33 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
2013-05-07 - House - 2nd Reading Amendment 2 by Taylor, Van (Y: 91 N: 47 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-05-25 | Effective on 9/1/13 | |
2013-05-25 | Signed by the Governor | |
2013-05-14 | Sent to the Governor | |
2013-05-14 | House | Signed in the House |
2013-05-14 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2013-05-13 | House | Senate concurs in House amendment(s)-reported |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Senate concurs in House amendment(s) |
2013-05-13 | Senate | Read |
2013-05-13 | Senate | House amendment(s) laid before the Senate |
2013-05-09 | Senate | House passage as amended reported |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-08 | House | Passed |
2013-05-08 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-08 | House | Read 3rd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Passed to 3rd reading as amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Record vote |
2013-05-07 | House | Amendment tabled |
2013-05-07 | House | Statement of Leg. Intent Recorded in Journal |
2013-05-07 | House | Amended |
2013-05-07 | House | Read 2nd time |
2013-05-07 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion |
2013-05-06 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2013-05-05 | House | Committee report distributed |
2013-05-04 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2013-04-30 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2013-04-30 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-22 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2013-04-22 | House | Read first time |
2013-04-18 | House | Received from the Senate |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Passed |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Record vote |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2013-04-17 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2013-04-15 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2013-04-09 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2013-04-08 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2013-03-05 | Senate | Read first time |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Filed |
2013-02-25 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Civil Remedies & Liabilities
Health Care Providers
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident
Health Care Providers
Insurance
INSURANCE, COMMISSIONER OF
INSURANCE, TEXAS DEPARTMENT OF
Insurance--Health & Accident