TX SB861 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-3)
Status: Passed on May 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-13 - Effective on 9/1/23
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Relating to coordination of vision and eye care benefits under certain health benefit plans and vision benefit plans.
Title
Relating to coordination of vision and eye care benefits under certain health benefit plans and vision benefit plans.
Sponsors
Sen. Bryan Hughes [R] | Sen. Morgan LaMantia [D] | Rep. Brad Buckley [R] | Rep. Dewayne Burns [R] |
Rep. Stan Gerdes [R] | Rep. Abel Herrero [D] | Rep. Janie Lopez [R] | Rep. Ray Lopez [D] |
Rep. Candy Noble [R] | Rep. Angelia Orr [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-28 - House - Read 3rd time RV#733 (Y: 147 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Read 3rd time (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-04-20 - Senate - Three day rule suspended (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-13 | Effective on 9/1/23 | |
2023-05-13 | Signed by the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | Sent to the Governor | |
2023-05-02 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-05-02 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-05-01 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-05-01 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-04-28 | House | Record vote RV#733 |
2023-04-28 | House | Passed |
2023-04-28 | House | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Passed to 3rd reading |
2023-04-27 | House | Read 2nd time |
2023-04-27 | House | Laid out in lieu of companion CSHB 1322 |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report sent to Calendars |
2023-04-26 | House | Committee report distributed |
2023-04-26 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2023-04-25 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2023-04-25 | House | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-24 | House | Referred to Insurance |
2023-04-24 | House | Read first time |
2023-04-21 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Reported engrossed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Passed |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Three day rule suspended |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Read 2nd time & passed to engrossment |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Reported favorably as substituted |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-04-12 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Health & Human Services |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HB1322 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1322 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call
HB1322 (Same As) 2023-04-27 - Laid on the table subject to call