TX SCR17 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-04-10 - Referred to State Affairs
Pending: House State Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification the "Keep Nine" amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Title
Urging Congress to propose and submit to the states for ratification the "Keep Nine" amendment to the U.S. Constitution.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 22 N: 9 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Amendment fails of adoption (Y: 9 N: 22 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2023-03-14 - Senate - Rules suspended-Regular order of business (Y: 26 N: 5 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-04-10 | House | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-03-15 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amendment fails of adoption |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Amendment(s) offered FA1 Gutierrez |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Rules suspended-Regular order of business |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Placed on intent calendar |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Vote taken in committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2023-02-27 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Referred to State Affairs |
2023-02-17 | Senate | Read first time |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2023-02-13 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR22 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
HCR22 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
HCR22 (Same As) 2023-03-02 - Referred to State Affairs
Subjects
KEEP NINE AMENDMENT
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
Resolutions--Memorializing Congress
Resolutions--United States Constitution