TX SCR42 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Renaming Building G at the Department of State Health Services Central Complex as the Dr. Robert Bernstein Building.
Title
Renaming Building G at the Department of State Health Services Central Complex as the Dr. Robert Bernstein Building.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-01 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-31 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-30 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-28 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-28 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-27 | Adopted | |
2009-05-27 | Laid before the House | |
2009-05-27 | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar | |
2009-05-25 | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars | |
2009-05-23 | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar | |
2009-05-22 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-22 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-19 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-19 | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent | |
2009-05-19 | Testimony taken/registration(s) recorded in committee | |
2009-05-19 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-19 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-04-30 | Referred to Public Health | |
2009-04-23 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-04-23 | Adopted | |
2009-04-23 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-04-23 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-04-23 | Placed on local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-04-08 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-04-08 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-04-06 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-04-06 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-04-06 | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . | |
2009-03-31 | Referred to Administration | |
2009-03-31 | Read first time | |
2009-03-11 | Filed | |
2009-03-11 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Resolutions
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
ROBERT BERNSTEIN BUILDING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF
Resolutions--Legislative Policy
ROBERT BERNSTEIN BUILDING
STATE HEALTH SERVICES, DEPARTMENT OF