TX SCR58 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 10 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-10 - Signed by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Designating Levelland as the official City of Mosaics of Texas.
Title
Designating Levelland as the official City of Mosaics of Texas.
Sponsors
Sen. Charles Perry [R] | Rep. Ken King [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-05-22 - House - Adopted RV#1604 (Y: 141 N: 2 NV: 2 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-10 | Signed by the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2019-05-25 | House | Signed in the House |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2019-05-22 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2019-05-22 | Senate | House passage reported |
2019-05-22 | House | Record vote RV#1604 |
2019-05-22 | House | Adopted |
2019-05-22 | House | Laid before the House |
2019-05-22 | House | Placed on Local, Consent, and Res. Calendar |
2019-05-20 | House | Considered in Local & Consent Calendars |
2019-05-15 | House | Comm. report sent to Local & Consent Calendar |
2019-05-14 | House | Committee report distributed |
2019-05-14 | House | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator |
2019-05-10 | House | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) |
2019-05-10 | House | Recommended to be sent to Local & Consent |
2019-05-10 | House | Considered in formal meeting |
2019-05-07 | House | Referred to Culture, Recreation & Tourism |
2019-05-03 | House | Received from the Senate |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Vote recorded in Journal |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Adopted |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Placed on local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Committee report printed and distributed |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Reported favorably w/o amendments |
2019-05-01 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Referred to Administration |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Permission to introduce |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
CITY OF MOSAICS
LEVELLAND, CITY OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous
LEVELLAND, CITY OF
Resolutions
Resolutions--Official Designations
Resolutions--Official Designations--Miscellaneous