TX SCR6 | 2023-2024 | 88th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on January 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-01-24 - Filed with the Secretary of State
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Providing for a joint session to canvass the votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and for a joint session for the inaugural ceremony.
Title
Providing for a joint session to canvass the votes for the governor and lieutenant governor and for a joint session for the inaugural ceremony.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2023-01-11 - House - Adopted RV#3 (Y: 149 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-01-10 - Senate - Adopted (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-01-24 | Filed with the Secretary of State | |
2023-01-24 | House | Signed in the House |
2023-01-18 | Senate | Signed in the Senate |
2023-01-11 | Senate | Reported enrolled |
2023-01-11 | Senate | House passage reported |
2023-01-11 | House | Received from the Senate |
2023-01-11 | House | Record vote RV#3 |
2023-01-11 | House | Adopted |
2023-01-11 | House | Laid before the House |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Record vote |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Adopted |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Read |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Laid before the Senate |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
2023-01-10 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Subjects
Elections
Elections--General
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Miscellaneous
Elections--General
Governor
Legislature
LIEUTENANT GOVERNOR
Resolutions
Resolutions--Administration
Resolutions--Joint Session
Resolutions--Miscellaneous