TX SCR72 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Granting Gulf Energy Exploration Corporation permission to sue the Railroad Commission of Texas.
Title
Granting Gulf Energy Exploration Corporation permission to sue the Railroad Commission of Texas.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-06-03 | Signed in the House | |
2009-06-02 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-06-01 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-06-01 | House passage reported | |
2009-06-01 | Statement(s) of vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-06-01 | Record vote | |
2009-06-01 | Adopted | |
2009-06-01 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-30 | 1 hr. notice-to suspend rules | |
2009-05-29 | Committee report sent to Calendars | |
2009-05-29 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-28 | Comte report filed with Committee Coordinator | |
2009-05-28 | Reported favorably w/o amendment(s) | |
2009-05-28 | Considered in formal meeting | |
2009-05-25 | Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-22 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Record vote | |
2009-05-22 | Adopted | |
2009-05-22 | Read 2nd time | |
2009-05-22 | Record vote | |
2009-05-22 | Rules suspended-Regular order of business | |
2009-05-21 | Placed on intent calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Committee report printed and distributed | |
2009-05-14 | Recommended for local & uncontested calendar | |
2009-05-14 | Reported favorably w/o amendments | |
2009-05-13 | Testimony taken in committee | |
2009-05-13 | Considered in public hearing | |
2009-05-13 | Posting rule suspended | |
2009-05-13 | Referred to Jurisprudence | |
2009-05-13 | Read first time | |
2009-05-13 | Permission to introduce | |
2009-05-13 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
HCR256 (Same As) 2009-05-21 - Referred to Judiciary & Civil Jurisprudence