TX SCR76 | 2009-2010 | 81st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-06-19 - Signed by the Governor
Summary
Commending Saint Mary's University on implementing the Frank Madla, Jr., and Irma Rangel Legislative Internship Program.
Title
Commending Saint Mary's University on implementing the Frank Madla, Jr., and Irma Rangel Legislative Internship Program.
Sponsors
Sen. John Carona [R] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D] | Sen. Roland Gutierrez [D] | Rep. David Leibowitz [D] |
Sen. Carlos Uresti [D] | Sen. Leticia Van De Putte [D] | Rep. Tara Ybarra [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-06-19 | Signed by the Governor | |
2009-05-25 | Sent to the Governor | |
2009-05-23 | Signed in the House | |
2009-05-23 | Signed in the Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Reported enrolled | |
2009-05-22 | House passage reported | |
2009-05-22 | Adopted | |
2009-05-22 | Rules suspended | |
2009-05-22 | Received from the Senate | |
2009-05-22 | Vote recorded in Journal | |
2009-05-22 | Adopted | |
2009-05-22 | Read | |
2009-05-22 | Laid before the Senate | |
2009-05-20 | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |