TX SJR43 | 2019-2020 | 86th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Pending: Senate Property Tax Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Proposing a constitutional amendment to extend the number of days that certain tangible personal property that is exempt from ad valorem taxation due to its location in this state for a temporary period may be located in this state for the purpose of qualifying for the tax exemption.
Title
Proposing a constitutional amendment to extend the number of days that certain tangible personal property that is exempt from ad valorem taxation due to its location in this state for a temporary period may be located in this state for the purpose of qualifying for the tax exemption.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-26 | Senate | Left pending in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Testimony taken in committee |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Considered in public hearing |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Scheduled for public hearing on . . . |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Referred to Property Tax |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Read first time |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Co-author authorized |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Received by the Secretary of the Senate |
Same As/Similar To
SB1005 (Enabled by) 2019-03-26 - Left pending in committee
Subjects
Economic & Industrial Development
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Economic & Industrial Development--General
Property Interests
Property Interests--Personal Property
Resolutions
Resolutions--Constitutional Amendments
Taxation
Taxation--Property-Appraisals & Appraisal Districts
Taxation--Property-Exemptions
Texas State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://capitol.texas.gov/BillLookup/History.aspx?LegSess=86R&Bill=SJR43 |
Text | https://capitol.texas.gov/tlodocs/86R/billtext/html/SJ00043I.htm |