US HB1157 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 16 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-02 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To clarify the United States interest in certain submerged lands in the area of the Monomoy National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes. This bill states that Congress finds that the United States did not acquire any right, title, or interest in or to submerged lands in Nantucket Sound (near the coast of Massachusetts) or the waters above those submerged lands as a result of the taking described in the civil action, United States v. 3,000 Acres of Land (D. Mass. 1944). That taking involved land that is now part of the Monomoy National Wildlife Refuge.
Title
To clarify the United States interest in certain submerged lands in the area of the Monomoy National Wildlife Refuge, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. William Keating [D-MA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-02 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 406. |
2018-02-02 | House | Reported by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 115-541. |
2017-12-13 | House | Ordered to be Reported by Voice Vote. |
2017-12-13 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-12-12 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2017-04-05 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2017-03-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2017-02-16 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2017-02-16 | House | Introduced in House |
Subjects
Land transfers
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Massachusetts
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Massachusetts
Public lands and natural resources
Wilderness and natural areas, wildlife refuges, wild rivers, habitats