US HB1170 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 27-0)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To enhance Social Security benefits and ensure the long-term solvency of the Social Security program.
Title
Social Security Expansion Act
Sponsors
Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR] | Rep. Brendan Boyle [D-PA] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] |
Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] | Rep. Stephen Lynch [D-MA] | Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ] |
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] | Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Seth Moulton [D-MA] | Rep. James McGovern [D-MA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA] | Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN] | Rep. Jesus Garcia [D-IL] | Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA] |
Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD] | Rep. Bennie Thompson [D-MS] | Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Railroads, Pipelines, and Hazardous Materials. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the Committee on Ways and Means, and in addition to the Committees on Education and Labor, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB860 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Social Security.
SB269 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB478 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1950 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB269 (Related) 2019-01-30 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB478 (Related) 2019-02-13 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1950 (Related) 2019-06-25 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
Subjects
Accounting and auditing
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment taxes
Financial services and investments
Government trust funds
Higher education
Income tax rates
Inflation and prices
Railroads
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
Congressional oversight
Disability assistance
Elementary and secondary education
Employment taxes
Financial services and investments
Government trust funds
Higher education
Income tax rates
Inflation and prices
Railroads
Self-employed
Social security and elderly assistance
Social welfare
Transportation employees
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1170/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1170/BILLS-116hr1170ih.pdf |