US HB1186 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-25 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Pending: House Armed Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits federal funds from being used to: (1) transfer any individual detained by the United States at Naval Station Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, to any military installation or federal detention center in Virginia; or (2) house any such individual at a Virginia installation or detention center.
Title
To prohibit the use of funds to transfer individuals detained at Naval Station, Guantanamo Bay, Cuba, to facilities in Virginia or to house such individuals at such facilities.
Sponsors
Rep. Eric Cantor [R-VA] | Rep. Randy Forbes [R-VA] | Rep. Robert Wittman [R-VA] | Rep. Frank Wolf [R-VA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-02-25 | Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services. |
Same As/Similar To
HB817 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB829 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1073 (Related) 2009-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1566 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1638 (Related) 2009-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB2315 (Related) 2009-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB829 (Related) 2009-02-03 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1073 (Related) 2009-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1566 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB1638 (Related) 2009-03-19 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
HB2315 (Related) 2009-05-07 - Referred to the House Committee on Armed Services.
Subjects
Appropriations
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Cuba
Detention of persons
Latin America
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Virginia
Armed forces and national security
Caribbean area
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Cuba
Detention of persons
Latin America
Military facilities and property
Terrorism
Virginia
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1186/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1186/BILLS-111hr1186ih.pdf |