US HB1216 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-02-13 - Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources.
Pending: House Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Revises the authorized route of the North Country National Scenic Trail to extend it to the Appalachian Trail in Vermont and to modify the route in northeastern Minnesota.
Title
North Country National Scenic Trail Route Adjustment Act
Sponsors
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] | Rep. Pete Stauber [R-MN] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Mark Pocan [D-WI] |
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Elise Stefanik [R-NY] | Rep. Don Beyer [D-VA] | Rep. Angela Craig [D-MN] |
Rep. Chris Collins [R-NY] | Rep. Glenn Grothman [R-WI] | Rep. James Sensenbrenner [R-WI] | Rep. John Moolenaar [R-MI] |
Rep. Collin Peterson [D-MN] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-13 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2019-02-13 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB47 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Became Public Law No: 116-9. (TXT | PDF)
SB96 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
SB96 (Same As) 2019-01-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
HCR21 (Similar To) 2019-02-28 - Message on Senate action sent to the House.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1216/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1216/BILLS-116hr1216ih.pdf |