US HB1226 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-13 - Became Public Law No: 118-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on November 13 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-11-13 - Became Public Law No: 118-21.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 38, United States Code, to allow for the electronic request of certain records, and for other purposes.
Title
Wounded Warrior Access Act
Sponsors
Rep. Pete Aguilar [D-CA] | Rep. Michael Lawler [R-NY] | Rep. Victoria Spartz [R-IN] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-07 - House - On Motion to Suspend the Rules and Pass, as Amended RC# 132 (Y: 422 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 12) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-11-13 | House | Became Public Law No: 118-21. |
2023-11-13 | House | Signed by President. |
2023-11-09 | House | Presented to President. |
2023-11-06 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S5335) |
2023-11-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. |
2023-03-08 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-03-07 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2023-03-07 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 422 - 0 (Roll no. 132). |
2023-03-07 | House | Considered as unfinished business. |
2023-03-07 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2023-03-07 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1226. |
2023-03-07 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. |
2023-03-07 | House | Mr. Bost moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2023-02-28 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2023-02-28 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2803 (Related) 2023-09-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. (Sponsor introductory remarks on measure: CR S4528)