US HB1233 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 29 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
Pending: House Agriculture Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to suspend, during the period December 31, 2010-December 31, 2011, the prohibition on the authority of the Secretary of Agriculture (USDA) to guarantee an agricultural operating loan for any year after the 15th year that a loan or loan guarantee is made to the borrower.
Title
To amend the Consolidated Farm and Rural Development Act to suspend a limitation on the period for which certain borrowers are eligible for guaranteed assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] |
Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-29 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1422 (Related) 2011-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Credit.
SB368 (Related) 2011-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB368 (Related) 2011-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1233/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1233/BILLS-112hr1233ih.pdf |