US HB1422 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-3)
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Credit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 7 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Credit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to suspend the limitation on the period for which borrowers are eligible for loan guarantee assistance through December 31, 2013.
Title
To amend the Farm Security and Rural Investment Act of 2002 to extend the suspension of the limitation on the period for which certain borrowers are eligible for guaranteed assistance.
Sponsors
Rep. Leonard Boswell [D-IA] | Rep. Charles Boustany [R-LA] | Rep. Bruce Braley [D-IA] | Rep. G. Butterfield [D-NC] |
Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT] | Rep. Steve King [R-IA] | Rep. Tom Latham [R-IA] | Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] |
Sen. Peter Welch [D-VT] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Department Operations, Oversight, and Credit. |
2011-04-07 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1233 (Related) 2011-03-29 - Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture.
SB368 (Related) 2011-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB368 (Related) 2011-02-16 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1422/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1422/BILLS-112hr1422ih.pdf |