US HB1305 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 31 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits Members of Congress, including Delegates and the Resident Commissioner, and the President from receiving basic pay for any period in which: (1) there is more than a 24-hour lapse in appropriations for any federal agency or department as a result of a failure to enact a regular appropriations bill or continuing resolution, or (2) the federal government is unable to make payments or meet obligations because the public debt limit has been reached. Prohibits retroactive payment of such forfeited pay.
Title
To prohibit Members of Congress, including the Delegates and the Resident Commissioner to the Congress, and the President from receiving pay during Government shutdowns.
Sponsors
Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy. |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to House House Administration |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-03-31 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Government Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
HB819 (Related) 2012-08-20 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Workforce, U.S. Postal Service, and Labor Policy.
SB388 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Held at the desk.
SB388 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Held at the desk.
Subjects
Appropriations
Budget deficits and national debt
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers
Budget deficits and national debt
Government employee pay, benefits, personnel management
Government operations and politics
Members of Congress
Presidents and presidential powers
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1305/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1305/BILLS-112hr1305ih.pdf |