US HB1326 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

ACCESS Act Authorizing Critical Conservation and Enabling Sportsmen and Sportswomen Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

ACCESS Act Authorizing Critical Conservation and Enabling Sportsmen and Sportswomen Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-03-26HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
2019-03-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
2019-03-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Livestock and Foreign Agriculture.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water, Oceans, and Wildlife.
2019-03-07HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-02-25HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Agriculture, Transportation and Infrastructure, and Appropriations, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-02-22HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB1550 (Related) 2019-03-27 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Biotechnology, Horticulture, and Research.
SB754 (Related) 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
HB1747 (Related) 2019-09-25 - Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
SB1139 (Related) 2019-04-10 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.

Subjects

Advisory bodies
Animal and plant health
Animal protection and human-animal relationships
Appropriations
Aquatic ecology
Birds
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Department of the Interior
Ecology
Endangered and threatened species
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Executive agency funding and structure
Federal district courts
Firearms and explosives
Fishes
Government trust funds
Hunting and fishing
Intergovernmental relations
Lakes and rivers
Land use and conservation
Licensing and registrations
Mammals
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Outdoor recreation
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Photography and imaging
Public lands and natural resources
Research administration and funding
Solid waste and recycling
State and local finance
State and local government operations
Tax-exempt organizations
Television and film
User charges and fees
Water use and supply
Wetlands
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection

US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback