US SB754 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-2)
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 12 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-12 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
Pending: Senate Environment And Public Works Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishes the National Fish Habitat Board to (1) encourage partnerships among public agencies and other interested parties to promote fish conservation, (2) establish national goals and priorities for fish habitat conservation, (3) recommend to Congress entities for designation as a Fish Habitat Partnership, and (4) review and make recommendations regarding fish habitat conservation projects. The U.S. Fish and Wildlife Service, the National Oceanic and Atmospheric Administration, the Environmental Protection Agency, and the U.S. Geological Survey may provide technical and scientific assistance to the partnerships, participants in the fish habitat conservation projects, and the board.
Title
National Fish Habitat Conservation Act of 2019
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Crapo [R-ID] | Sen. Benjamin Cardin [D-MD] | Sen. Margaret Hassan [D-NH] | Sen. Doug Jones [D-AL] |
Sen. Tammy Baldwin [D-WI] | Sen. Susan Collins [R-ME] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-12 | Senate | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1326 (Related) 2019-03-26 - Subcommittee Hearings Held.
HB1747 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
HB1747 (Related) 2019-11-26 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 255.
HB729 (Related) 2019-12-12 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation.
SB3051 (Related) 2020-10-30 - Became Public Law No: 116-188. (TXT | PDF)
Subjects
Advisory bodies
Congressional oversight
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
Congressional oversight
Fishes
Hunting and fishing
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Public lands and natural resources
Public-private cooperation
Wildlife conservation and habitat protection
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/senate-bill/754/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/s754/BILLS-116s754is.pdf |