US HB1334 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 201-0)
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend the Federal Election Campaign Act of 1971 to provide for additional disclosure requirements for corporations, labor organizations, Super PACs and other entities, and for other purposes.
Title
DISCLOSE Act of 2021 Democracy Is Strengthened by Casting Light On Spending in Elections Act of 2021
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution, Civil Rights, and Civil Liberties. |
2021-02-25 | House | Referred to the Committee on House Administration, and in addition to the Committees on Ways and Means, and the Judiciary, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-02-25 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB1 (Related) 2021-03-11 - Received in the Senate.
HB1279 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB443 (Same As) 2022-07-19 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-331.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1171 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2671 (Related) 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
SB4822 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 346. (CR S4949-4950)
HB1279 (Related) 2021-04-28 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB443 (Same As) 2022-07-19 - Committee on Rules and Administration. Hearings held. Hearings printed: S.Hrg. 117-331.
SB1 (Related) 2021-08-11 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 123.
HB1516 (Related) 2021-03-02 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
HB1171 (Related) 2021-02-18 - Referred to the House Committee on House Administration.
SB2093 (Related) 2021-09-15 - Cloture motion on the motion to proceed to the measure withdrawn by unanimous consent in Senate. (CR S6516-6517)
SB2671 (Related) 2021-08-07 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 120.
SB4822 (Related) 2022-09-22 - Cloture on the motion to proceed to the measure not invoked in Senate by Yea-Nay Vote. 49 - 49. Record Vote Number: 346. (CR S4949-4950)
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1334/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1334/BILLS-117hr1334ih.pdf |