US HB1344 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum:
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on September 9 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-09-09 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Pending: Senate Health, Education, Labor, And Pensions Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act of 2015 (Sec. 3) This bill amends the Public Health Service Act to expand programs for deaf and hard-of-hearing newborns and infants to include young children. The programs are revised and reauthorized for FY2016-FY2020.
Title
Early Hearing Detection and Intervention Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Lois Capps [D-CA] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] |
Sen. Marsha Blackburn [R-TN] | Rep. Elijah Cummings [D-MD] | Rep. David Roe [R-TN] | Rep. Andy Harris [R-MD] |
Rep. David Loebsack [D-IA] | Rep. Scott Rigell [R-VA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Mike Thompson [D-CA] |
Rep. Steve Stivers [R-OH] | Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] | Rep. Bobby Rush [D-IL] |
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Michael Burgess [R-TX] | Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH] |
Rep. Pete Olson [R-TX] | Rep. Bill Pascrell [D-NJ] | Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA] | Rep. Renee Ellmers [R-NC] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Adrian Smith [R-NE] | Rep. Adam Smith [D-WA] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] |
Sen. Kyrsten Sinema [I-AZ] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-09-09 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions. |
2015-09-08 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-09-08 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H5794-5795) |
2015-09-08 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1344. |
2015-09-08 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H5794-5796) |
2015-09-08 | House | Mr. Guthrie moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-09-08 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 182. |
2015-09-08 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Energy and Commerce. H. Rept. 114-241. |
2015-07-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-07-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-07-23 | House | Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by Voice Vote . |
2015-07-23 | House | Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-03-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2015-03-10 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Energy and Commerce. |
2015-03-10 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB2424 (Related) 2015-12-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Health, Education, Labor, and Pensions.
Subjects
Child health
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Surgery and anesthesia
Health
Health information and medical records
Health programs administration and funding
Hearing, speech, and vision care
Medical research
Medical tests and diagnostic methods
Surgery and anesthesia