US HB1377 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 129-17)
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 26 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-14 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Includes veterans who participated in the cleanup of Enewetak Atoll in the Marshall Islands between January 1, 1977, and December 31, 1980, as radiation-exposed veterans for purposes of the Department of Veterans Affairs presumption of service-connection for specified cancers. Under a presumption of service-connection, specific diseases diagnosed in certain veterans are presumed to have been caused by the circumstances of their military service. Health care benefits and disability compensation may then be awarded.
Title
Mark Takai Atomic Veterans Healthcare Parity Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Disability Assistance and Memorial Affairs. |
2019-03-04 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E235) |
2019-02-26 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2019-02-26 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB555 (Related) 2019-02-26 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
Subjects
Armed forces and national security
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
Cancer
Marshall Islands
Nuclear weapons
Radiation
Veterans' pensions and compensation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/1377/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr1377/BILLS-116hr1377ih.pdf |