US HB1434 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 10-1)
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 8 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-23 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry.
Pending: House Conservation and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Chattahoochee-Oconee National Forest Land Adjustment Act This bill authorizes the Department of Agriculture (USDA) to sell or exchange any or all interest of the United States in 30 tracts of National Forest System land in Georgia totaling approximately 3,841 acres. USDA may reserve any rights-of-way or other rights or interests in land sold or exchanged under this bill that is considered necessary for management purposes or to protect the public interest. USDA may not sell or exchange land under this bill for less than market value, as determined by an appraisal or through a competitive bid. The bill requires proceeds to be used for the acquisition of land for national forest purposes in Georgia.
Title
Chattahoochee-Oconee National Forest Land Adjustment Act
Sponsors
Rep. Doug Collins [R-GA] | Rep. Earl Carter [R-GA] | Rep. Rick Allen [R-GA] | Rep. Barry Loudermilk [R-GA] |
Rep. Drew Ferguson [R-GA] | Rep. Jody Hice [R-GA] | Rep. Tom Graves [R-GA] | Rep. Austin Scott [R-GA] |
Rep. Karen Handel [R-GA] | Rep. Rob Woodall [R-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2017-03-08 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Agriculture. |
2017-03-08 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB571 (Same As) 2017-03-08 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Agriculture, Nutrition, and Forestry.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
SB2099 (Related) 2017-11-16 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 262.
SB3042 (Related) 2018-06-18 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 470.
HB2 (Related) 2018-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 115-334.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/115th-congress/house-bill/1434/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/115/bills/hr1434/BILLS-115hr1434ih.pdf |