US HB1471 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-2)
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on October 27 2009 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2009-12-14 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Redesignates the Jimmy Carter National Historic Site in Georgia as the Jimmy Carter National Historical Park. Requires, in the administration of the Historical Park, the preservation and interpretation of a southern agricultural-based rural community during the early to middle years of the 20th century. Adds specified real property needed to enhance the visitor experience at the site, including additional acreage surrounding the boyhood home of former President Jimmy Carter. Authorizes the acquisition, by donation only, of: (1) other lands and interests in the environs of Plains, Georgia, containing natural, cultural, or historic resources consistent with the purposes of the Park; and (2) the Georgia Welcome Center on State Route 280/27.
Title
To expand the boundary of the Jimmy Carter National Historic Site in the State of Georgia, to redesignate the unit as a National Historical Park, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. John Barrow [D-GA] | Rep. Sanford Bishop [D-GA] | Rep. Phil Gingrey [R-GA] | Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA] |
Rep. Jack Kingston [R-GA] | Rep. John Lewis [D-GA] | Rep. Jim Marshall [D-GA] | Rep. David Scott [D-GA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-12-14 | Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. | |
2009-10-27 | Received in the Senate. | |
2009-10-26 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-10-26 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H11744) | |
2009-10-26 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1471. | |
2009-10-26 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H11744-11745) | |
2009-10-26 | Ms. Bordallo moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. | |
2009-10-21 | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 173. | |
2009-10-21 | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 111-307. | |
2009-09-30 | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Unanimous Consent. | |
2009-09-30 | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. | |
2009-09-30 | Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands Discharged. | |
2009-05-14 | Subcommittee Hearings Held. | |
2009-03-16 | Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests and Public Lands. | |
2009-03-12 | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
Same As/Similar To
SB742 (Related) 2009-07-22 - Committee on Energy and Natural Resources Subcommittee on National Parks. Hearings held.
Subjects
Georgia
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidential administrations
Public lands and natural resources
Rural conditions and development
U.S. history
Historic sites and heritage areas
Land transfers
Parks, recreation areas, trails
Presidential administrations
Public lands and natural resources
Rural conditions and development
U.S. history