US HB1496 | 2023-2024 | 118th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 41.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-05-16 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 41.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To upgrade the communications service used by the National Weather Service, and for other purposes.
Title
National Weather Service Communications Improvement Act
Sponsors
Rep. Randy Feenstra [R-IA] | Rep. Salud Carbajal [D-CA] | Rep. Mariannette Miller-Meeks [R-IA] | Rep. Suzanne Bonamici [D-OR] |
Rep. Max Miller [R-OH] | Rep. Ashley Hinson [R-IA] | Rep. Jenniffer Gonzalez-Colon [R-PR] | Rep. Eric Crawford [R-AR] |
Rep. Jeff Jackson [D-NC] | Rep. Deborah Ross [D-NC] | Rep. Doug LaMalfa [R-CA] | Rep. Eric Sorensen [D-IL] |
Rep. Amata Radewagen [R-AS] | Rep. Valerie Foushee [D-NC] | Rep. Brian Fitzpatrick [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Carey [R-OH] |
Rep. Summer Lee [D-PA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-16 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 41. |
2023-05-16 | House | Reported by the Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. H. Rept. 118-61. |
2023-03-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 36 - 0. |
2023-03-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2023-03-09 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Science, Space, and Technology. |
2023-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB1414 (Related) 2023-12-22 - Held at the desk.