US HB1506 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 14-0)
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 2 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-12-14 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 454.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To provide for the accurate reporting of fossil fuel extraction and emissions by entities with leases on public land, and for other purposes.
Title
Transparency in Energy Production Act of 2021
Sponsors
Rep. Alan Lowenthal [D-CA] | Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Mike Levin [D-CA] | Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA] |
Rep. Katie Porter [D-CA] | Rep. Jared Huffman [D-CA] | Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
Rep. Diana DeGette [D-CO] | Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN] | Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN] | Rep. Mike Quigley [D-IL] |
Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] | Rep. Teresa Fernandez [D-NM] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-12-14 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 454. |
2022-12-14 | House | Committee on Agriculture discharged. |
2022-12-14 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 117-631, Part I. |
2021-05-05 | House | Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 24 - 15. |
2021-05-05 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-05 | House | Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources Discharged. |
2021-04-28 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation and Forestry. |
2021-03-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Energy and Mineral Resources. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |