US HB1510 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-64.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 5-2)
Status: Passed on November 23 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-11-23 - Became Public Law No: 117-64.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress a report on the use of cameras in medical facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Title
To direct the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to submit to Congress a report on the use of cameras in medical facilities of the Department of Veterans Affairs.
Sponsors
Rep. David McKinley [R-WV] | Rep. David Trone [D-MD] | Rep. Alexander Mooney [R-WV] | Rep. Carol Miller [R-WV] |
Rep. Guy Reschenthaler [R-PA] | Rep. Mike Bost [R-IL] | Rep. Suzanne Lee [D-NV] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-11-23 | House | Became Public Law No: 117-64. |
2021-11-23 | House | Signed by President. |
2021-11-16 | House | Presented to President. |
2021-11-03 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent. |
2021-11-02 | Senate | Senate Committee on Veterans' Affairs discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S7685) |
2021-05-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-05-18 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to section 5 of H. Res. 403, and the motion offered by Mr. Hoyer, the following bills passed under suspension of the rules: H.R. 144, as amended; H.R. 204, as amended; H.R. 210, as amended; H.R. 240; H.R. 707, as amended; H.R. 711, as amended; H.R. 1157, as amended; H.R. 1447, as amended; H.R. 1510, as amended; H.R. 1711, as amended; H.R. 2027; H.R. 2167, as amended; H.R. 2441; H.R. 2494; H.R. 2533; H.R. 2655, as amended; H.R. 2695, H.R. 2704; H.R. 2788; H.R. 2878, as amended; and H.R. 3008. (consideration: CR H2482-2520; text: CR H2509) |
2021-05-18 | House | Pursuant to the provisions of H. Res. 403, proceedings on H.R. 1510 are considered vacated. |
2021-05-17 | House | At the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed. |
2021-05-17 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1510. |
2021-05-17 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H2372-2373; text: CR H2372-2373) |
2021-05-17 | House | Mr. Takano moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2021-05-04 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-05-04 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations Discharged. |
2021-05-04 | House | Subcommittee on Health Discharged. |
2021-04-27 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Oversight and Investigations. |
2021-04-15 | House | Subcommittee Hearings Held. |
2021-04-14 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Health. |
2021-03-02 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs. |
2021-03-02 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB539 (Related) 2021-06-23 - Committee on Veterans' Affairs. Hearings held.
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
HR403 (Related) 2021-05-18 - Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.