US HB1541 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Became Public Law No: 111-10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on March 20 2009 - 100% progression
Action: 2009-03-20 - Became Public Law No: 111-10.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Extends through July 31, 2009, under the same terms and conditions, the authorization for any program, authority, or provision, including any pilot program, that is currently authorized through March 20, 2009, under the Small Business Act or the Small Business Investment Act of 1958.
Title
To provide for an additional temporary extension of programs under the Small Business Act and the Small Business Investment Act of 1958, and for other purposes.
Sponsors
Rep. Kathleen Dahlkemper [D-PA] | Rep. Parker Griffith [R-AL] | Rep. Joe Sestak [D-PA] | Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-20 | Became Public Law No: 111-10. | |
2009-03-20 | Signed by President. | |
2009-03-19 | Presented to President. | |
2009-03-18 | Message on Senate action sent to the House. | |
2009-03-17 | Cleared for White House. | |
2009-03-17 | Received in the Senate, read twice, considered, read the third time, and passed without amendment by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S3318) | |
2009-03-17 | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. | |
2009-03-17 | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H3468) | |
2009-03-17 | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1541. | |
2009-03-17 | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H3468-3469) | |
2009-03-17 | Ms. Velazquez moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill. | |
2009-03-17 | Referred to the House Committee on Small Business. |
Subjects
Commerce
Government lending and loan guarantees
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Women in business
Government lending and loan guarantees
Minority and disadvantaged businesses
Public contracts and procurement
Small business
Women in business