US HB1541 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on December 1 2015 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-12-01 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
Pending: Senate Energy And Natural Resources Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
PRISM Act Preservation Research at Institutions Serving Minorities Act (Sec. 2) This bill makes Hispanic-serving institutions and Asian American and Native American Pacific Islander-serving institutions of higher education eligible for technical and financial assistance from the Department of the Interior to establish preservation training and degree programs.
Title
PRISM Act Preservation Research at Institutions Serving Minorities Act
Sponsors
Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] | Rep. Lacy Clay [D-MO] | Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL] |
Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY] | Rep. Juan Vargas [D-CA] | Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Beto O'Rourke [D-TX] |
Sen. Ben Lujan [D-NM] | Rep. Filemon Vela [D-TX] | Rep. Charles Rangel [D-NY] | Rep. Jerry McNerney [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-12-01 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources. |
2015-11-30 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2015-11-30 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8428) |
2015-11-30 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1541. |
2015-11-30 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8428-8429) |
2015-11-30 | House | Mr. LaMalfa moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2015-09-30 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 207. |
2015-09-30 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Natural Resources. H. Rept. 114-275. |
2015-09-10 | House | Subcommittee on Federal Lands Discharged. |
2015-09-10 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2015-09-10 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-09-09 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2015-04-07 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Federal Lands. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Natural Resources. |
2015-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB805 (Related) 2015-03-19 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Energy and Natural Resources.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
SB2012 (Related) 2016-09-08 - Conference held.
Subjects
Education programs funding
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources
Higher education
Historic sites and heritage areas
Minority education
Public lands and natural resources