US HB1556 | 2015-2016 | 114th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2015 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
Pending: House Subcommittee on the Constitution And Civil Justice Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Civil Rights Voting Restoration Act of 2015 Declares that the right of a U.S. citizen to vote in any election for federal office shall not be denied or abridged because the individual has been convicted of a non-violent criminal offense, unless, at the time of the election, the individual is serving a sentence in a correctional facility or a term of probation. Restores the right to vote of an individual on probation: (1) on the date the term of probation ends, if such term is less than one year; or (2) one year after the date the individual begins serving the term of probation, if such term is one year or longer. Directs the Attorney General to determine and establish a list of the criminal offenses under federal and state law that are non-violent criminal offenses. Provides for enforcement of, and remedies for violations of, this Act. Sets forth requirements for state and federal notification of individuals of their voting rights pursuant to this Act. Prohibits a state, local government, or other person from receiving or using federal grant amounts to construct or improve a place of incarceration unless that person has in effect a program under which each incarcerated individual is notified, upon release, of his or her rights under this Act.
Title
Civil Rights Voting Restoration Act of 2015
Sponsors
Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] | Rep. Corrine Brown [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-21 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice. |
2015-03-23 | House | Referred to the House Committee on the Judiciary. |
2015-03-23 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB12 (Related) 2015-04-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Higher Education and Workforce Training.
HB1459 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB457 (Same As) 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB772 (Related) 2015-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
HB1459 (Related) 2015-04-21 - Referred to the Subcommittee on the Constitution and Civil Justice.
SB457 (Same As) 2015-02-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB772 (Related) 2015-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Civil actions and liability
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Law enforcement administration and funding
Voting rights
Civil rights and liberties, minority issues
Correctional facilities and imprisonment
Criminal procedure and sentencing
Law enforcement administration and funding
Voting rights
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/114th-congress/house-bill/1556/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/114/bills/hr1556/BILLS-114hr1556ih.pdf |