US HB1598 | 2009-2010 | 111th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-03-18 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
AIG Key Executives Bonus Accountability and Capture (TAKE BACK) Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code to impose a 100% income tax on bonuses (over $1) paid to employees by entities who received financial assistance under the Troubled Asset Relief Program (TARP).
Title
AIG Key Executives Bonus Accountability and Capture (TAKE BACK) Act
Sponsors
Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2009-03-18 | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. | |
2009-03-18 | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E701-702) |
Same As/Similar To
HB1518 (Related) 2009-03-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1527 (Related) 2009-03-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1542 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1543 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1572 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1586 (Related) 2010-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 111-226.
HB1801 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3452 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Referred to House Financial Services
HB1527 (Related) 2009-03-16 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1542 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1543 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1572 (Related) 2009-03-17 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB1586 (Related) 2010-08-10 - Became Public Law No: 111-226.
HB1801 (Related) 2009-03-30 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
HB3452 (Related) 2009-07-31 - Referred to House Financial Services
Subjects
Corporate finance and management
Financial crises and stabilization
Income tax rates
Taxation
Wages and earnings
Financial crises and stabilization
Income tax rates
Taxation
Wages and earnings
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/111th-congress/house-bill/1598/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/111/bills/hr1598/BILLS-111hr1598ih.pdf |