US HB1634 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 15 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-04-15 - Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means.
Pending: House Ways And Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Superfund Polluter Pays Act - Amends the Internal Revenue Code by reinstating until January 1, 2019, the Hazardous Substance Superfund financing rate and the corporate environmental income tax.
Title
Superfund Polluter Pays Act
Sponsors
Rep. Frank Pallone [D-NJ] | Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-15 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Ways and Means. |
Same As/Similar To
HB1596 (Related) 2011-04-25 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy.
SB461 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1496 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5264)
SB461 (Related) 2011-03-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Finance.
SB1496 (Related) 2011-08-02 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Commerce, Science, and Transportation. (text of measure as introduced: CR S5264)
Subjects
Government trust funds
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Pollution liability
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
Hazardous wastes and toxic substances
Pollution liability
Sales and excise taxes
Taxation
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1634/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1634/BILLS-112hr1634ih.pdf |