US HB166 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 4 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-06-07 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 263.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To establish an Office of Fair Lending Testing to test for compliance with the Equal Credit Opportunity Act, to strengthen the Equal Credit Opportunity Act and to provide for criminal penalties for violating such Act, and for other purposes.
Title
Fair Lending for All Act
Sponsors
Rep. Al Green [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-07 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 263. |
2022-06-07 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Financial Services. H. Rept. 117-349. |
2021-05-12 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 28 - 24. |
2021-05-12 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-01-04 | House | Referred to the House Committee on Financial Services. |
2021-01-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB2543 (Related) 2022-06-21 - Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Banking, Housing, and Urban Affairs.