US HB1691 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 9 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-18 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To direct the Secretary of Homeland Security to issue guidance to identify firearms business operations of licensed manufacturers and licensed dealers as essential businesses during certain national emergencies, and for other purposes.
Title
Second Amendment Protection Act
Sponsors
Rep. Clay Higgins [R-LA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security. |
2021-03-10 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management. |
2021-03-09 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Ways and Means, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-09 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
HB38 (Related) 2021-03-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
SB4501 (Related) 2022-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
SB4501 (Related) 2022-07-11 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/117th-congress/house-bill/1691/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/117/bills/hr1691/BILLS-117hr1691ih.pdf |