US HB1872 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Republican 19-1)
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 12 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-06-08 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Employment Protection Act of 2011 - Requires the Administrator of the Environmental Protection Agency (EPA), prior to issuing a regulation, policy statement, guidance, or other requirement, implementing any new or substantially altered program, or issuing or denying any permit, to analyze its impact on employment levels and economic activity, disaggregated by state. Requires such analysis to include estimated job losses and decreased economic activity due to the denial or issuance of permits, including permits issued under the Federal Water Pollution Control Act (commonly known as the Clean Water Act). Requires the Administrator to: (1) post such analysis on EPA's website and request governors of states experiencing more than a de minimis negative impact to post such analysis in their capitols; (2) hold public hearings in each state in which a requirement, program, or permit will have more than a de minimis negative impact; and (3) give notice of such impact in a state to such state's congressional delegation, governor, and legislature at least 45 days prior to the effective date of such requirement or program or the denial or issuance of a permit. Defines "de minimis negative impact" to mean: (1) with respect to employment levels, a loss of more than 100 jobs; and (2) with respect to economic activity, a decrease in economic activity of more than $1,000,000 over any calendar year.
Title
Employment Protection Act of 2011
Sponsors
Sen. Shelley Capito [R-WV] | Rep. Spencer Bachus [R-AL] | Rep. Roscoe Bartlett [R-MD] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] |
Sen. Bill Cassidy [R-LA] | Rep. Mark Critz [D-PA] | Rep. John Duncan [R-TN] | Rep. Jo Emerson [R-MO] |
Rep. Brett Guthrie [R-KY] | Rep. Jaime Herrera Beutler [R-WA] | Rep. Bill Johnson [R-OH] | Rep. Walter Jones [R-NC] |
Rep. Mike Kelly [R-PA] | Rep. John Kline [R-MN] | Rep. Robert Latta [R-OH] | Sen. Cynthia Lummis [R-WY] |
Rep. Thaddeus McCotter [R-MI] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] | Rep. Aaron Schock [R-IL] | Rep. Steve Southerland [R-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-06-08 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Conservation, Energy, and Forestry. |
2011-05-23 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Environment and the Economy. |
2011-05-13 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Water Resources and Environment. |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Agriculture |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Transportation and Infrastructure |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to House Energy and Commerce |
2011-05-12 | House | Referred to the Committee on Energy and Commerce, and in addition to the Committees on Transportation and Infrastructure, and Agriculture, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Same As/Similar To
SB1292 (Related) 2011-06-29 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Environment and Public Works.
SB1720 (Related) 2011-10-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
SB1720 (Related) 2011-10-18 - Read the second time. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 203.
Subjects
Administrative law and regulatory procedures
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Licensing and registrations
Public participation and lobbying
Unemployment
Water quality
Civil actions and liability
Congressional oversight
Economic performance and conditions
Environmental protection
Environmental Protection Agency (EPA)
Environmental regulatory procedures
Government information and archives
Government studies and investigations
Licensing and registrations
Public participation and lobbying
Unemployment
Water quality
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/1872/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr1872/BILLS-112hr1872ih.pdf |