US HB1872 | 2017-2018 | 115th Congress
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 115-330.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 45-11)
Status: Passed on December 19 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-12-19 - Became Public Law No: 115-330.
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Reciprocal Access to Tibet Act of 2018 (Sec. 4) This bill requires the Department of State to report to Congress annually regarding the level of access Chinese authorities granted U.S. diplomats, journalists, and tourists to Tibetan areas in China. Such assessment shall include: a comparison with the level of access granted to other areas of China, a comparison between the levels of access granted to Tibetan and non-Tibetan areas in relevant provinces, a comparison of the level of access in the reporting year and the previous year, and a description of the measures that impede the freedom to travel in Tibetan areas. (Sec. 5) No individual who is substantially involved in the formulation or execution of policies related to access for foreigners to Tibetan areas may enter the United States if: the requirement that foreigners must receive official permission to enter the Tibet Autonomous Region remains in effect, or has been replaced by a similar regulation that also requires foreigners to gain a level of permission to enter the Tibet Autonomous Region that is not required for other provinces; and travel restrictions on U.S. diplomats, officials, journalists, and citizens to Tibet Autonomous areas in Sichuan, Qinghai, Yunnan, and Gansu Provinces are greater than travel restrictions to other areas. The State Department shall report to Congress annually, identifying individuals who were blocked from U.S. entry during the preceding year and a list of Chinese officials who were substantially involved in the formulation or execution of policies to restrict the access of U.S. diplomats, journalists, and citizens to Tibetan areas.
Title
Reciprocal Access to Tibet Act of 2018
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-330. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Became Public Law No: 115-330. |
2018-12-19 | Senate | Signed by President. |
2018-12-13 | Senate | Presented to President. |
2018-12-12 | Senate | Message on Senate action sent to the House. |
2018-12-11 | Senate | Passed Senate without amendment by Voice Vote. (consideration: CR S7453) |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 701. |
2018-11-29 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Reported by Senator Corker without amendment. Without written report. |
2018-11-28 | Senate | Committee on Foreign Relations. Ordered to be reported without amendment favorably. |
2018-09-26 | Senate | Received in the Senate and Read twice and referred to the Committee on Foreign Relations. |
2018-09-25 | House | The title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | Motion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection. |
2018-09-25 | House | On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by voice vote. (text: CR H8849-8850) |
2018-09-25 | House | DEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1872. |
2018-09-25 | House | Considered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H8849-8853) |
2018-09-25 | House | Mr. Rutherford moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended. |
2018-07-25 | House | Ordered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2018-07-25 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2017-05-18 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Asia and the Pacific. |
2017-05-02 | House | Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H3005-3006) |
2017-05-01 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration and Border Security. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committee on Foreign Affairs, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2017-04-04 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB821 (Same As) 2017-04-04 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on the Judiciary.
Subjects
Asia
China
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government information and archives
International affairs
News media and reporting
Sanctions
Tibet
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports
China
Congressional oversight
Diplomacy, foreign officials, Americans abroad
Government information and archives
International affairs
News media and reporting
Sanctions
Tibet
Travel and tourism
Visas and passports