US HB1882 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 63-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Menstrual Equity For All Act of 2019

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Menstrual Equity For All Act of 2019

Sponsors

Rep. Grace Meng [D-NY]Rep. Joyce Beatty [D-OH]Rep. Earl Blumenauer [D-OR]Rep. Tony Cardenas [D-CA]
Rep. Judy Chu [D-CA]Rep. David Cicilline [D-RI]Rep. Yvette Clarke [D-NY]Rep. Steve Cohen [D-TN]
Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA]Rep. Rosa DeLauro [D-CT]Rep. Sylvia Garcia [D-TX]Rep. Raul Grijalva [D-AZ]
Rep. Debra Haaland [D-NM]Rep. Alcee Hastings [D-FL]Rep. Jahana Hayes [D-CT]Rep. Pramila Jayapal [D-WA]
Rep. Henry Johnson [D-GA]Rep. Robin Kelly [D-IL]Rep. Ro Khanna [D-CA]Rep. Barbara Lee [D-CA]
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA]Rep. Zoe Lofgren [D-CA]Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY]Rep. Sean Maloney [D-NY]
Rep. Betty McCollum [D-MN]Rep. Gwen Moore [D-WI]Rep. Joseph Morelle [D-NY]Rep. Jerrold Nadler [D-NY]
Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC]Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY]Rep. Ilhan Omar [D-MN]Rep. Donald Payne [D-NJ]
Rep. Ayanna Pressley [D-MA]Rep. Jamie Raskin [D-MD]Rep. Harley Rouda [D-CA]Rep. Lucille Roybal-Allard [D-CA]
Rep. Janice Schakowsky [D-IL]Rep. Dina Titus [D-NV]Rep. Rashida Tlaib [D-MI]Rep. Paul Tonko [D-NY]
Rep. Nydia Velazquez [D-NY]Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL]Rep. Jennifer Wexton [D-VA]Rep. Ann Kuster [D-NH]
Rep. Joseph Kennedy [D-MA]Rep. Peter DeFazio [D-OR]Rep. Madeleine Dean [D-PA]Rep. Sheila Jackson-Lee [D-TX]
Rep. Debbie Mucarsel-Powell [D-FL]Rep. Grace Napolitano [D-CA]Rep. David Scott [D-GA]Rep. Kathy Castor [D-FL]
Rep. Katherine Clark [D-MA]Rep. Joe Courtney [D-CT]Rep. Nanette Barragan [D-CA]Rep. Eddie Johnson [D-TX]
Rep. Tim Ryan [D-OH]Rep. Kathleen Rice [D-NY]Rep. James McGovern [D-MA]Rep. Bonnie Coleman [D-NJ]
Rep. David Trone [D-MD]Rep. Lloyd Doggett [D-TX]Rep. Eliot Engel [D-NY]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Crime, Terrorism, and Homeland Security.
2019-04-10HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E448)
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Health.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Education and Labor, and in addition to the Committees on the Judiciary, Financial Services, Ways and Means, Energy and Commerce, and Transportation and Infrastructure, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseSponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR E355)
2019-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2403 (Related) 2019-05-01 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Economic Development, Public Buildings, and Emergency Management.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback