US HB1891 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on March 26 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-04-11 - Referred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
Pending: House Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

White Sands National Park Establishment Act

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

White Sands National Park Establishment Act

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-11HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on National Parks, Forests, and Public Lands.
2019-03-27HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseReferred to the Committee on Natural Resources, and in addition to the Committee on Armed Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned.
2019-03-26HouseIntroduced in House

Same As/Similar To

HB2500 (Related) 2019-07-12 - The Clerk was authorized to correct section numbers, punctuation, and cross references, and to make other necessary technical and conforming corrections in the engrossment of H.R. 2500.

Subjects


US Congress State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback