US HB2016 | 2019-2020 | 116th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 1 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Readiness Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the portion of the property known as the Veterans' Administration Center Reservation in Los Angeles California, which was conveyed by the General Services Administration (GSA) to the State of California for a proposed National Guard Armory, to be used for purposes of meeting the needs of the homeless. The bill directs the state to submit an application to the GSA for the use of such property to meet the needs of the homeless. The GSA and the Department of Health and Human Services must jointly determine whether the use of the property described in the application is a use for meeting the needs of the homeless. If it is determined that the proposed use of the property is for meeting the needs of the homeless, the GSA must modify the deed of conveyance for such property to authorize its use for homeless needs.
Title
To modify the authorized uses of certain property conveyed by the United States in Los Angeles, California.
Sponsors
Rep. Ted Lieu [D-CA] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Readiness. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-01 | House | Referred to the Committee on Armed Services, and in addition to the Committee on Financial Services, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2019-04-01 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB974 (Same As) 2019-04-01 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
HB2500 (Related) 2020-08-11 - Read twice. Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 512.
SB1790 (Related) 2019-12-20 - Became Public Law No: 116-92. (TXT | PDF)
HR758 (Similar To) 2019-12-11 - Mr. Nadler moved to table the motion to reconsider
Subjects
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/116th-congress/house-bill/2016/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/116/bills/hr2016/BILLS-116hr2016ih.pdf |