US HB2043 | 2021-2022 | 117th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 18 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-13 - Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157.
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
To amend title 5, United States Code, to require the Director of the Office of Personnel Management to establish and maintain a public directory of the individuals occupying Government policy and supporting positions, and for other purposes.
Title
PLUM Act Periodically Listing Updates to Management Act
Sponsors
Rep. Carolyn Maloney [D-NY] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. John Sarbanes [D-MD] | Rep. Eleanor Norton [D-DC] |
Rep. Kweisi Mfume [D-MD] | Rep. Alexandria Ocasio-Cortez [D-NY] | Rep. Joaquin Castro [D-TX] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-13 | House | Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 157. |
2021-12-13 | House | Committee on House Administration discharged. |
2021-11-30 | House | House Committee on House Administration Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Dec. 10, 2021. |
2021-11-01 | House | House Committee on House Administration Granted an extension for further consideration ending not later than Nov. 30, 2021. |
2021-11-01 | House | Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Oversight and Reform. H. Rept. 117-169, Part I. |
2021-06-29 | House | Ordered to be Reported in the Nature of a Substitute (Amended) by Voice Vote. |
2021-06-29 | House | Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held. |
2021-03-18 | House | Referred to the Committee on Oversight and Reform, and in addition to the Committee on House Administration, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
2021-03-18 | House | Introduced in House |
Same As/Similar To
SB857 (Related) 2021-03-18 - Read twice and referred to the Committee on Homeland Security and Governmental Affairs.
SB3650 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 574.
SB3650 (Related) 2022-12-05 - Placed on Senate Legislative Calendar under General Orders. Calendar No. 574.