US HB2047 | 2011-2012 | 112th Congress
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 14-7-1)
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 26 2011 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-07-29 - Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit.
Pending: House Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Caribbean Coral Reef Protection Act of 2011 - States that it shall be U.S. policy to: (1) undertake measures to deny the government of Cuba, the Cuban Communist Party, or any of their instrumentalities the financial resources to engage in activities that threaten U.S. security and other interests, threaten Florida's marine environment and the environment of the submerged lands off Cuba's coast, and prolong the dictatorship that oppresses the Cuban people; and (2) deter foreign investments that would enhance the Cuban regime's ability to develop its petroleum resources. Amends the Cuban Liberty and Democratic Solidarity (LIBERTAD) Act of 1996 to exclude from U.S. entry an alien who: (1) is an officer or principal of an entity, or a shareholder who owns a controlling interest in an entity that, on or after January 10, 2005, has made or makes an investment of $1 million or more (or any combination of investments that equals or exceeds $1 million in any 12-month period) that contributes to Cuba's ability to develop petroleum resources off its submerged lands; or (2) is a spouse, minor child, or agent of such person. Exempts on a case-by-case basis entries: (1) for medical reasons or property-related litigation, or (2) where a transition government is in place. Directs the President to impose two or more specified export, procurement, financial institution, loan, or Export-Import Bank sanctions if the President determines that a person has made, on or after January 10, 2005, an investment of $1 million or more (or any combination of investments that in the aggregate equals or exceeds $1 million in any 12-month period) that contributes to the enhancement of Cuba's ability to develop petroleum resources off its submerged lands or has made an investment of any amount of money that contributes to such an enhancement and has trafficked in confiscated U.S. property. Makes it illegal for a U.S. person to facilitate Cuba's ability to develop petroleum resources off its submerged lands. Directs the Secretary of State to report annually respecting the impact of the development of Cuba's petroleum resources on the environment and natural resources of Cuba's submerged lands and Florida's marine environment.
Title
Caribbean Coral Reef Protection Act of 2011
Sponsors
Rep. Ileana Ros-Lehtinen [R-FL] | Rep. Gus Bilirakis [R-FL] | Rep. Vern Buchanan [R-FL] | Rep. Dan Burton [R-IN] |
Rep. Steve Chabot [R-OH] | Rep. Gerald Connolly [D-VA] | Rep. Mario Diaz-Balart [R-FL] | Rep. Eni Faleomavaega [D-AS] |
Rep. Michael Grimm [R-NY] | Rep. Brian Higgins [D-NY] | Rep. Connie Mack [R-FL] | Rep. Jeff Miller [R-FL] |
Rep. Pedro Pierluisi [N-PR] | Rep. Bill Posey [R-FL] | Rep. David Rivera [R-FL] | Rep. Dennis Ross [R-FL] |
Rep. Heath Shuler [D-NC] | Rep. Albio Sires [D-NJ] | Rep. Robert Turner [R-NY] | Rep. Debbie Wasserman Schultz [D-FL] |
Rep. Allen West [R-FL] | Rep. Frederica Wilson [D-FL] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Financial Institutions and Consumer Credit. |
2011-07-29 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on International Monetary Policy and Trade. |
2011-07-11 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Immigration Policy and Enforcement. |
2011-06-20 | House | Referred to the Subcommittee on Technology, Information Policy, Intergovernmental Relations and Procurement Reform . |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to House Oversight and Government Reform |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to House Financial Services |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to House Foreign Affairs |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2011-05-26 | House | Referred to the Committee on the Judiciary, and in addition to the Committees on Foreign Affairs, Financial Services, and Oversight and Government Reform, for a period to be subsequently determined by the Speaker, in each case for consideration of such provisions as fall within the jurisdiction of the committee concerned. |
Subjects
Caribbean area
Corporate finance and management
Cuba
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Family relationships
Florida
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Human rights
International affairs
Latin America
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
Corporate finance and management
Cuba
Environmental assessment, monitoring, research
Family relationships
Florida
Foreign and international corporations
Government lending and loan guarantees
Human rights
International affairs
Latin America
Marine and coastal resources, fisheries
Marine pollution
Oil and gas
Public contracts and procurement
Sanctions
U.S. and foreign investments
Visas and passports
US Congress State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.congress.gov/bill/112th-congress/house-bill/2047/all-info |
Text | https://www.congress.gov/112/bills/hr2047/BILLS-112hr2047ih.pdf |